Global Patent Index - EP 0934902 B1

EP 0934902 B1 2001-12-05 - Safety device for the severing of the neck of a bottle containing fizzy wine and utensil fitted with such a device

Title (en)

Safety device for the severing of the neck of a bottle containing fizzy wine and utensil fitted with such a device

Title (de)

Sicherheitsvorrichtung zum Schneiden des Halsteiles einer Sektflasche und mit einer solchen Vorrichtung ausgerüstetes Gerät

Title (fr)

Accessoire de sécurité pour le sabrage d'une bouteille de vin mousseux et ustensile de sabrage équipé d'un tel accessoire

Publication

EP 0934902 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 99400236 A

Priority

  • FR 9801488 A
  • US 27772399 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0934902A1] The safety device consists of a cord or chain (2) made from any suitable material - plastic, synthetic fibers, natural materials, balls of precious metal or links, attached at one end to the bottle neck (13) or cork, and at the other to a separate support. The separate support can be, for instance, on the handle (21) of the blade used for cracking the bottle neck, on a ring round the body or base of the bottle, or on an ice bucket used to cool the bottle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67B 7/92; B65D 55/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 55/16 (2006.01); B67B 7/92 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67B 7/92 (2013.01); B65D 55/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0934902 A1 19990811; EP 0934902 B1 20011205; FR 2774672 A1 19990813; FR 2774672 B1 20000407; US 6095352 A 20000801

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140227

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090203

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080430

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080220

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-02-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020201

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69900513 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2001-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001204

2000-05-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-04-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE LI

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000203

1999-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

1999-08-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI