Global patent index - EP 0935037 A3

EP 0935037 A3 2000-04-26 - Modular construction

Title (en)

Modular construction

Title (de)

Modularkonstruktion

Title (fr)

Construction modulaire

Publication

EP 0935037 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98124835 A

Priority

IT BO980057 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0935037A2] A modular structure includes modular box-like elements: an upright (3), which features front openings (3a) and two groups of holes: front holes (30a) and lateral holes (30b) spaced apart by a step (P); a connector (4) which features front openings (4a) and a group of holes (40a) spaced apart by a step (P); a transversal bar (5) which features front openings (5a) and two groups of holes: front holes (50a) and lateral holes (50b) spaced apart by a step (P). The upright (3), connector (4) and transversal bar (5) have the same transversal section. The modular structure includes also tightening means (9) which removably tighten the above mentioned basic modular elements (3, 4, 5) in the region of the front holes (30a, 40a, 50a) and/or lateral holes (30b, 40b, 50b). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 1/12; E04B 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/24 (2006.01); E04H 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/24 (2013.01); E04H 1/1272 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2406 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2451 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2454 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2457 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2469 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0935037 A2 19990811; EP 0935037 A3 20000426; IT 1299338 B1 20000316; IT BO980057 A1 19990804; IT BO980057 D0 19980204

INPADOC legal status

2001-09-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-08-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001027

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-08-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI