Global Patent Index - EP 0935051 A3

EP 0935051 A3 2001-05-16 - Method of forming a wellbore junction

Title (en)

Method of forming a wellbore junction

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Abzweigung einer Bohrung

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication d'une jonction dans un puits de forage

Publication

EP 0935051 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99300795 A

Priority

US 1892498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0935051A2] A method of forming a wellbore junction, the method comprising the steps of: drilling a first wellbore (12) intersecting a subterranean formation; drilling a second wellbore (18) intersecting the first wellbore (12) and the formation; and forcing a stabilizing material into the formation surrounding the intersection of the first and second wellbores. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 41/00; E21B 29/06; E21B 33/138

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 41/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 41/0042 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0935051 A2 19990811; EP 0935051 A3 20010516; AU 1134899 A 19990826; BR 9902419 A 20000418; CA 2260616 A1 19990805; NO 990512 A 19990806; NO 990512 D0 19990204

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-21 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030324

2002-03-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: GB NL

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011106

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 21B 41/00 A, 7E 21B 33/138 B, 7E 21B 29/06 B

1999-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): GB NL

1999-08-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI