Global Patent Index - EP 0935058 A3

EP 0935058 A3 2000-09-06 - Radiators and soundproofing engine enclosure designs

Title (en)

Radiators and soundproofing engine enclosure designs

Title (de)

Kühler und Maschinenlärmschutzumhüllung

Title (fr)

Projets des refroidisseurs et capots anti-son pour des moteurs

Publication

EP 0935058 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99300840 A

Priority

  • JP 3986398 A
  • JP 3986498 A
  • JP 3986898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0935058A2] Disclosed a radiator (30) that transfers heat from a cooling liquid (W) to a current of air (A) made to forcibly flow, and a soundproofing engine enclosure (35) design in which a soundproofing enclosure (35) shields the noise sources of a heat engine (31) and a motor generator (34) while a radiator (30) is outside the enclosure. The radiator (30) for cooling down the cooling liquid (W) circulating through the heat engine (31) is comprised of an inner cylinder (1), porous-metal bodies (3,4) arranged in the inner cylinder (1) and made of a metal such as aluminum or aluminum alloys high in thermal conductivity so as to have therein interconnecting voids permitting the current of air (A) to flow, and an outer cylinder (2) arranged around the inner cylinder (1) so as to provide an annular passage (11) for the cooling liquid (W). The soundproofing enclosure (35) shields an engine body (36), engine mount (38), water pump (42), fuel injection pump (43) and motor generator (34). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01P 3/18; F02B 77/13; F28D 7/10; F28F 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01P 3/18 (2006.01); F02B 77/13 (2006.01); F28D 7/10 (2006.01); F28F 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 7/106 (2013.01); F01P 3/18 (2013.01); F02B 77/13 (2013.01); F28F 13/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0935058 A2 19990811; EP 0935058 A3 20000906

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010307

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 01P 3/18 A, 7F 02B 77/13 B, 7F 28F 13/00 B, 7F 28D 7/10 B

1999-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-08-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI