Global Patent Index - EP 0935061 A3

EP 0935061 A3 2000-04-26 - Stationary gas engine

Title (en)

Stationary gas engine

Title (de)

Verbrennungsmotor, insbesondere stationärer Gasmotor

Title (fr)

Moteur stationnaire à combustion interne à gaz

Publication

EP 0935061 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98124381 A

Priority

AT 20998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0935061A2] The engine has a cylinder liner with a coolant channel (9) on the outside, which extends to the ring flange (4). Cylinder liner (1) and scraper ring (13) are of the same material. The liner is centered in the crank casing (5) with the outside (12) of its ring flange. The piston (10) decreases in size in the section above the groove (17) for the upper cylinder ring.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 1/14; F02B 77/04; F02F 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/10 (2006.01); F02F 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/16 (2013.01); F02F 1/14 (2013.01); F02F 2001/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0935061 A2 19990811; EP 0935061 A3 20000426; EP 0935061 B1 20040225; AT 260408 T 20040315; DE 59810841 D1 20040401; ES 2215269 T3 20041001

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-06 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20061206

2007-06-06 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20061206

2006-12-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061219

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061218

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-15 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20061215

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-14 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20061214

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-14 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: DEUTZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT PATENTE UND MARKEN

- Effective date: 20041117

2006-06-14 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: WAERTSILAE FINLAND OY

- Effective date: 20041124

2006-02-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060222

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-01-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DEUTZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFTPATENTE UND MARKEN

- Effective date: 20041117

2005-01-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: WAERTSILAE FINLAND OY

- Effective date: 20041124

2004-11-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2215269 T3

2004-06-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040520

2004-04-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810841 P 20040401

2004-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB

2004-02-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GE JENBACHER GMBH & CO. OHG

2003-12-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GE JENBACHER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020903

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000516

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 02F 1/14 A, 7F 02F 1/16 B, 7F 02B 77/04 B

1999-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB

1999-08-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI