Global Patent Index - EP 0935099 A3

EP 0935099 A3 2000-10-04 - Electrical household appliance with solar cell

Title (en)

Electrical household appliance with solar cell

Title (de)

Elekrisches Haushaltsgerät mit Solarzelle

Title (fr)

Appareil ménager avec cellule solaire

Publication

EP 0935099 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99102019 A

Priority

DE 19804399 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0935099A2] The equipment has an electrical controller, which is operated using control elements to control the mains-supplied electrical loads of the equipment, and a switching clock, which is supplied by at least one solar cell (21) or an accumulator. The clock controls the equipment in conjunction with the controller, which can be supplied by the solar cell or accumulator. The accumulator may be charged from a mains transformer as well as by the solar cell.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 7/08; G04G 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/08 (2006.01); G04C 10/02 (2006.01); G04G 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/087 (2013.01); G04C 10/02 (2013.01); G04G 15/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0935099 A2 19990811; EP 0935099 A3 20001004; EP 0935099 B1 20040630; DE 19804399 A1 19990812; DE 19804399 C2 20011031

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-08-11 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040602

2004-08-11 [REG GB ERR] ERRATUM

- Free text: THE GRANT DATE WILL BE HOWEVER DELETED BY THE EPO IN EUROPEAN PATENT BULLETIN NO. 2004/32 DATED 20040804. THE PATENT WAS ACTUALLY WITHDRAWN AT THE EPO ON 20040602.

2004-08-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909828 P 20040805

2004-08-04 [DB1] DELETION OF B1 DOCUMENT

2004-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-06-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-06-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROCH, KLEMENS DIPL.-ING. (FH)

2004-06-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ULMER, MICHAEL DIPL.-ING.

2004-06-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RABENSTEIN, KLAUS DIPL.-ING. (FH)

2004-06-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HERBST, JOHANN

2004-06-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FLEISSNER, REINHARD

2004-06-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHNELL, WOLFGANG DIPL.-ING.

2004-06-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GERL, JOSEF

2004-06-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MALLINGER, PETER DIPL.-ING. (FH)

2004-06-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZIMMERMANN, CHRISTIAN DIPL.-ING.

2004-06-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HOPFENMUELLER, BERND DIPL.-ING.

2004-06-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WAGNER, MICHAEL DR.-ING

2004-06-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: UNTERREINER, CHRISTIAN DIPL.-ING. (FH)

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021106

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-08-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI