Global patent index - EP 0935108 A3

EP 0935108 A3 2000-12-27 - Improvements relating to containers

Title (en)

Improvements relating to containers

Title (de)

Behälter

Title (fr)

Conteneur

Publication

EP 0935108 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99300178 A

Priority

GB 9801435 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0935108A2] A self cooling beverage container or can. In one embodiment water (26) is maintained at low pressure such that the boiling point is reduced. The water (26) is caused to boil and the vapour to be absorbed by a desiccant. The boiling of the water (26) causes heat to be absorbed from the beverage. The desiccant may be carbon (28). The water (26) or carbon (28) (or other chemicals) in one embodiment are maintained within a blind bore (30) within the container. The water and carbon are separated by a burstable membrane (42). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 31/00; F25B 17/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 17/08 (2006.01); F25D 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 31/007 (2013.01); F25B 17/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0935108 A2 19990811; EP 0935108 A3 20001227; GB 9801435 D0 19980318

INPADOC legal status

2005-02-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-04-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: CONTAINER

2004-03-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: CONTAINER

2003-06-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BRANDBREW S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030328

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE ES FR GB GR IT MC NL PT

2001-09-12 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: RO PAYMENT 20010618

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010618

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB GR IT MC NL PT

1999-08-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI