Global Patent Index - EP 0935115 A3

EP 0935115 A3 2000-03-29 - Heat exchanger constructed by plural heat conductive plates

Title (en)

Heat exchanger constructed by plural heat conductive plates

Title (de)

Mit mehreren wärmeleitenden Platten ausgeführter Wärmetauscher

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur fabriqué avec plusieurs plaques conductrices de chaleur

Publication

EP 0935115 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98120142 A

Priority

  • JP 2484298 A
  • JP 19207798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0935115A2] A pair of heat conductive plates (12) forming an evaporator core portion (11) has a plurality of projection ribs (14). The projection ribs (14) protrude toward outsides of the pair of heat conductive plates (12) for forming refrigerant passages thereinside. Air flows outside the heat conductive plate perpendicularly to a flow direction of the refrigerant, and is prevented from flowing straightly by the projection ribs (14)to make a turbulent flow. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 3/04; F28D 1/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/03 (2006.01); F28F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 3/04 (2013.01); F28D 1/0333 (2013.01); F28D 2021/0085 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0935115 A2 19990811; EP 0935115 A3 20000329; EP 0935115 B1 20030709; DE 69816260 D1 20030814; DE 69816260 T2 20040603

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141027

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141027

2015-07-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150630

2015-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141027

2015-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69816260

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131029

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131021

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131022

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131021

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-06-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-02-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69816260 P 20030814

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-07-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020214

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000411

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-08-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI