Global Patent Index - EP 0935221 A3

EP 0935221 A3 2000-02-02 - Remote authentication system

Title (en)

Remote authentication system

Title (de)

Fernbeglaubigungssystem

Title (fr)

Système d'authentification à distance

Publication

EP 0935221 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98123757 A

Priority

JP 2422598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0935221A2] To a user terminal (5), one or plural kinds of biometric acquisition devices (6-10) are connected, and in an authentication server (3), one or plural authentication information acquisition software are stored according to the user terminal (5) and/or a user. In accordance with the operation of a prescribed authentication acquisition software corresponding to the user terminal (5) and/or user, which is downloaded from the authentication server (3) in authentication, biometric information acquired by one or plural kinds of biometric acquisition devices and/or keyed-in user discrimination information are used.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 21/20 (2006.01); G06F 12/14 (2006.01); G06F 21/24 (2006.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01); H04L 9/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00087 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0935221 A2 19990811; EP 0935221 A3 20000202; EP 0935221 B1 20051102; DE 69832145 D1 20051208; DE 69832145 T2 20060720; JP H11224236 A 19990817

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051214

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070102

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061214

2007-10-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070831

2007-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20061214

2007-07-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070703

2006-10-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060803

2006-06-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-05-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2005-12-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051230

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051214

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69832145

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-12-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051129

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-11-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020416

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-08-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI