Global Patent Index - EP 0935231 A3

EP 0935231 A3 2000-04-12 - Advertising roller blind

Title (en)

Advertising roller blind

Title (de)

Rollvorhang-Werbevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Store à rouleau avec publicité

Publication

EP 0935231 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99102265 A

Priority

  • DE 19804551 A
  • DE 29901380 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0935231A2] A display system has flexible display panels hung from overhead rollers mounted on a frame. The alignment of the panels is either side by side or in a staggered area. The blinds are either rolled from and onto the rollers or are continuous loops rolled over the rollers. The rollers are driven by servo motors and the positions of the blinds are controlled by position sensors. The support frame can be dismantled for storage.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 11/295

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 1/12 (2006.01); G09F 11/22 (2006.01); G09F 11/26 (2006.01); G09F 11/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 1/12 (2013.01); G09F 11/22 (2013.01); G09F 11/26 (2013.01); G09F 11/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0935231 A2 19990811; EP 0935231 A3 20000412

INPADOC legal status


2001-07-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001013

2001-01-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-04-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 09F 11/295 A, 7G 09F 11/26 B, 7G 09F 11/28 B

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-08-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI