Global patent index - EP 0935273 A3

EP 0935273 A3 2000-03-22 - Fuse link for cartridge fuse

Title (en)

Fuse link for cartridge fuse

Title (de)

Schmelzleiter für einen elektrischen Sicherungseinsatz

Title (fr)

Conducteur fusible pour cartouche à fusible

Publication

EP 0935273 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98122731 A

Priority

  • DE 19804331 A
  • DE 19846349 A
  • US 23330799 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6075434A] A fusible element for an electrical fuse comprising a generally flat, strip-shaped body having a generally uniform cross-section; a constricted area formed in the body has a cross-section less than the cross-section of the body; an indentation formed in the body at least bordering on the constricted area; a solder coating disposed within the indentation; and a first solder stop coating on a first surface of the body that is disposed adjacent the solder coating to prevent migration of the coating along the surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 85/11

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 85/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 85/11 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49107 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6075434 A 20000613; EP 0935273 A2 19990811; EP 0935273 A3 20000322

INPADOC legal status

2005-05-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041112

2004-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040701

2002-08-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FERRAZ SHAWMUT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000919

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-08-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI