Global Patent Index - EP 0935359 A3

EP 0935359 A3 2000-03-01 - Broadcast receiver and method for operating such

Title (en)

Broadcast receiver and method for operating such

Title (de)

Rundfunkempfänger und Verfahren zum Betreiben eines solchen

Title (fr)

Appareil de radio et procédé pour mettre en marche un tel appareil

Publication

EP 0935359 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99102129 A

Priority

DE 19805043 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0935359A2] The receiver contains a receiver unit (2), an output unit (4), a control unit (6), an analysis unit (8) and a memory (9). The analysis unit analyses programs that have been preselected by the user for common characteristic properties in order to determine the user's listening habits. Only those programs corresp. to the user's listening habits are presented for listening or output. An Independent claim is also included for a method of operating the receiver.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04H 60/33 (2008.01); H04H 60/47 (2008.01); H04H 60/65 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 60/65 (2013.01); H04H 60/33 (2013.01); H04H 60/47 (2013.01); H04H 2201/13 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0935359 A2 19990811; EP 0935359 A3 20000301; DE 19805043 A1 19990819; DE 19805043 B4 20131010

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-24 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20130523

2011-10-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04H 60/33 20080101AFI20110909BHEP

2011-10-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04H 60/47 20080101ALI20110909BHEP

2011-10-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04H 60/65 20080101ALI20110909BHEP

2006-08-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HARMAN BECKER AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS GMBH

2001-09-19 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2001-09-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000901;LT PAYMENT 20000901;LV PAYMENT 20000901;MK PAYMENT 20000901;RO PAYMENT 20000901;SI PAYMENT 20000901

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000309

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1999-08-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI