Global Patent Index - EP 0935504 B1

EP 0935504 B1 2001-12-12 - PROCESS FOR EXTRUDING A METAL SECTION

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR EXTRUDING A METAL SECTION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES METALLPROFILSTRANGES

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION PAR EXTRUSION D'UNE BARRE PROFILEE EN METAL

Publication

EP 0935504 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97943712 A

Priority

  • EP 97943712 A
  • CH 9700391 W
  • EP 96810732 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0839589A1] A process is disclosed for extruding a profiled section (40) made at least partially of a metallic material. A preform (36) is extruded in a partially solid or partially liquid state into a section (40) and the extruded section in the partially solid or partially liquid state is guided through a chilling mould (16) in which it solidifies. The corresponding device has an optionally heatable preform chamber (12) for receiving the preforms (36), an optionally heatable moulding chamber (14) which follows the preform chamber and in which the preform (36) is extruded into a profiled section (40), and a chilling mould (16) that follows the moulding chamber (14) and in which the profiled section solidifies. A matrix (18) can be arranged directly after the mould (16) for giving its final shape to the cross section of the profiled section. This process and device enable profiled sections to be produced with areas made of different materials across their cross sections.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 23/00; B21C 29/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 23/00 (2006.01); B21C 29/02 (2006.01); B21C 29/04 (2006.01); C22C 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 1/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0839589 A1 19980506; CA 2270069 A1 19980514; DE 59705808 D1 20020124; EP 0935504 A1 19990818; EP 0935504 B1 20011212; JP 2001503678 A 20010321; NO 312156 B1 20020402; NO 992170 A 19990504; NO 992170 D0 19990504; US 6360576 B1 20020326; WO 9819803 A1 19980514

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051020

2006-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060503

2005-10-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051020

2005-10-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051020

2004-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041130

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041020

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041013

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020313

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705808 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-11-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCAN TECHNOLOGY & MANAGEMENT AG

2001-03-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000829

1999-08-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990604

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT