Global Patent Index - EP 0935654 A4

EP 0935654 A4 2000-07-05 - FIBROBLAST GROWTH FACTOR HOMOLOGOUS FACTOR-3 (FHF-3) AND METHODS OF USE

Title (en)

FIBROBLAST GROWTH FACTOR HOMOLOGOUS FACTOR-3 (FHF-3) AND METHODS OF USE

Title (de)

FIBROBLASTENWACHSTUMSFAKTOR HOMOLOGER FAKTOR-3 (FHF-3) UND VERWENDUNGSMETHODEN

Title (fr)

FACTEUR 3 HOMOLOGUE DU FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE DES FIBROBLASTES (FHF-3) ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION

Publication

EP 0935654 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97916166 A

Priority

  • US 9704641 W
  • US 62114396 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9735007A1] A novel protein, fibroblast growth factor homologous factor-3 (FHF-3), the polynucleotide sequence encoding FHF-3, and the deduced amino acid sequence are disclosed. Also disclosed are diagnostic and therapeutic methods of using the FHF-3 polypeptide and polynucleotide sequences and antibodies which specifically bind to FHF-3.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; C07K 14/50; C12N 15/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/02 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/70 (2006.01); A61K 31/7088 (2006.01); A61K 35/76 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61K 49/00 (2006.01); A61K 51/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/02 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/50 (2006.01); C07K 16/22 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/50 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); C12N 2799/027 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [PX] WO 9639506 A1 19961212 - HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al
  • [E] WO 9808864 A1 19980305 - UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS MED [US]
  • [X] HILLIER L. ET AL.: "The WashU-Merck EST Project; ym27b06.r1 Homo sapiens cDNA clone 49284 5' similar to SP:FGF9_HUMAN P31371 GLIA-ACTIVATING FACTOR PRECURSOR", EMBL DATABASE ENTRY HS590166; ACCESSION NO. H15590, 3 July 1995 (1995-07-03), XP002134209
  • [X] BRODY L ET AL: "Construction of Transcription Map Surrounding the BRCA1 Locus of Human Chromosome 17", GENOMICS, vol. 25, no. 1, 1 January 1995 (1995-01-01), pages 238 - 247, XP002093717, ISSN: 0888-7543 & BRODY L. C. ET AL.: "Construction of a transcription map surrounding the BRCA1 locus of human chromosome 17; MTO120 Homo sapiens genomic clone MTO120", EMBL DATABASE ENTRY HS21510; ACCESSION NO. T27215, 31 December 1994 (1994-12-31), XP002134210BRODY L. C. ET AL.Construction of a transcription map surrounding the BRCA1 locus of human chromosome 17; MTO120 Homo sapiens genomic clone MTO120EMBL DATABASE ENTRY HS21510; ACCESSION NO. T2721519941231
  • See also references of WO 9735007A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9735007 A1 19970925; AU 2341597 A 19971010; AU 719538 B2 20000511; CA 2249179 A1 19970925; EP 0935654 A1 19990818; EP 0935654 A4 20000705; IL 126298 D0 19990509; JP 2000509965 A 20000808

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-23 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20060415

2000-07-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000518

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-08-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981014

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE