Global Patent Index - EP 0935678 A4

EP 0935678 A4 2002-11-27 - METHODS FOR TREATING BIPOLAR MOOD DISORDER ASSOCIATED WITH MARKERS ON CHROMOSOMES 18p

Title (en)

METHODS FOR TREATING BIPOLAR MOOD DISORDER ASSOCIATED WITH MARKERS ON CHROMOSOMES 18p

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Behandlung von bipolaren Gemütskrankheitenassoziert mit Erkennungssequenzen auf Chromosom18p

Title (fr)

PROCEDES DE TRAITEMENT DE LA PSYCHOSE MANIACO-DEPRESSIVE ASSOCIES A DES MARQUEURS SUR LE CHROMOSOME 18p

Publication

EP 0935678 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97939536 A

Priority

  • US 9714892 W
  • US 2343896 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9807887A1] The present invention is directed to methods of detecting the presence of a bipolar mood disorder susceptibility locus in an individual, comprising analyzing a sample of DNA for the presence of a DNA polymorphism on the short arm of chromosome 18 between the telomere and D18S481, wherein the DNA polymorphism is associated with a form of bipolar mood disorder. The invention for the first time provides strong evidence of a susceptibility gene for bipolar mood disorder that is located in the terminal 5 cM region of the short arm of chromosome 18. The disclosure describes the use of linkage analysis and genetic markers in this 5 cM region to fine map the region and the use of genetic markers to genetically diagnose (genotype) bipolar mood disorder in individuals, to confirm phenotypic diagnoses of bipolar mood disorder, to determine appropriate treatments for patients with particular genotypic subtypes. Isolated polynucleotides useful for genetic linkage analysis of BP-I and methods for obtaining such isolated polynucleotides are also described.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/6883 (2013.01); C12Q 2600/156 (2013.01); C12Q 2600/172 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] STINE O C ET AL: "Evidence for linkage of bipolar disorder to chromosome 18 with a parent-of-origin effect", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF HUMAN GENETICS,US,UNIVERSITY OF CHICAGO PRESS, CHICAGO,, vol. 57, no. 6, 1 December 1995 (1995-12-01), pages 1384 - 1394, XP002087610, ISSN: 0002-9297
  • [X] OVERHAUSER J ET AL: "Report of the Third International Workshop on human chromosome 18 mapping 1995.", CYTOGENETICS AND CELL GENETICS, vol. 71, no. 2, 1995, pages 106 - 119, XP000972758, ISSN: 0301-0171
  • See also references of WO 9807887A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9807887 A1 19980226; AU 4160497 A 19980306; AU 714932 B2 20000113; CA 2264198 A1 19980226; EP 0935678 A1 19990818; EP 0935678 A4 20021127; JP 2001500367 A 20010116

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050301

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030310

2002-11-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021014

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2002-11-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 12Q 1/68 A

1999-08-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990315

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL