Global Patent Index - EP 0935692 B1

EP 0935692 B1 2002-11-27 - FABRIC TREATED WITH CELLULASE AND OXIDOREDUCTASE

Title (en)

FABRIC TREATED WITH CELLULASE AND OXIDOREDUCTASE

Title (de)

GEWEBE BEHANDELT MIT CELLULASE UND OXIDOREDUCTASE

Title (fr)

TISSU TRAITE AVEC DE LA CELLULASE ET DE L'OXYDOREDUCTASE

Publication

EP 0935692 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97900194 A

Priority

  • DK 9700002 W
  • DK 2496 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9725468A1] The invention deals with a process for providing an abraded look with a reduced strength loss in dyed fabric comprising (a) contacting, in an aqueous medium, a dyed fabric with a cellulase in a concentration corresponding to 0.01-250 mu g of enzyme protein per g of fabric; (b) simultaneously or subsequently treating said fabric with a phenol oxidizing enzyme system and an enhancing agent.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06M 16/00; C11D 3/386; D06L 3/02; D06P 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06L 3/02 (2006.01); C11D 3/28 (2006.01); C11D 3/34 (2006.01); C11D 3/386 (2006.01); C12S 3/02 (2006.01); D06M 16/00 (2006.01); D06P 1/642 (2006.01); D06P 1/651 (2006.01); D06P 5/02 (2006.01); D06P 5/04 (2006.01); D06P 5/06 (2006.01); D06P 5/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06P 1/65106 (2013.01); C11D 3/28 (2013.01); C11D 3/349 (2013.01); C11D 3/38645 (2013.01); C11D 3/38654 (2013.01); D06M 16/003 (2013.01); D06P 1/6426 (2013.01); D06P 1/65118 (2013.01); D06P 1/65193 (2013.01); D06P 5/02 (2013.01); D06P 5/04 (2013.01); D06P 5/06 (2013.01); C11D 3/3418 (2013.01); C11D 3/3472 (2013.01); D06P 5/158 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9725468 A1 19970717; AU 1366797 A 19970801; BR 9706965 A 19990504; CN 1130483 C 20031210; CN 1218524 A 19990602; DE 69717486 D1 20030109; DE 69717486 T2 20030717; EP 0935692 A1 19990818; EP 0935692 B1 20021127; ES 2187748 T3 20030616; JP 2000503075 A 20000314; JP 3977429 B2 20070919; MA 24059 A1 19971001; MX 9805592 A 19981031; PL 186471 B1 20040130; PL 327815 A1 19990104; PT 935692 E 20030430; TR 199801300 T2 19981021

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140108

2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150109

2016-02-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160226

2015-10-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150708

2015-07-15 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20150708

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140108

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140930

2014-10-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69717486

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140108

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69717486

2014-06-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20140107

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20131211

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130204

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130102

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130103

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120112

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040801

2004-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040801

2004-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *NOVOZYMES A/S

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-07-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2187748 T3

2003-05-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030219

2003-03-11 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030311

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030228

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69717486 20030109

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-27 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-27 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021127

2001-01-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVOZYMES A/S

2000-05-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000407

1999-08-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980812

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT