Global Patent Index - EP 0935732 B1

EP 0935732 B1 2001-03-07 - REFRIGERATOR

Title (en)

REFRIGERATOR

Title (de)

KÄLTEGERÄT

Title (fr)

APPAREIL FRIGORIFIQUE

Publication

EP 0935732 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97942886 A

Priority

  • DE 29616623 U
  • EP 9704677 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9813655A1] A refrigerator has a housing with an inner plastic lining (13) surrounded by a heat-insulating material (12) and fitted at its outer side facing the heat-insulating material (12) with a reinforcement body (20) embedded in the heat-insulating material (12) for holding components on the inner lining by means of screw-like fastening means (31). The reinforcement body (20) is provided with at least one receiving section (21) that can be form-fitted and/or frictionally connected to a cup-shaped cavity (14) in the inner lining (13). The receiving section (21) is joined to a fastening section (27) with a prefabricated bore (30) into which screw-like self-cutting fastening means (31) can be inserted.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 23/06; F16B 37/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 23/067 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29616623 U1 19961128; BR 9713216 A 20000404; CN 1135348 C 20040121; CN 1238037 A 19991208; EP 0935732 A1 19990818; EP 0935732 B1 20010307; ES 2157087 T3 20010801; TR 9900752 T2 19990621; WO 9813655 A1 19980402

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070827

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060828

2007-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20060828

2007-06-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070430

2006-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050829

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050819

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-02-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2157087

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-05-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-04-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59703116

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-12

2001-04-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2000-06-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000511

1999-08-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990423

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT