Global Patent Index - EP 0935733 B1

EP 0935733 B1 2000-07-19 - BUILT-IN REFRIGERATING APPARATUS

Title (en)

BUILT-IN REFRIGERATING APPARATUS

Title (de)

EINBAU-KÄLTEGERÄT

Title (fr)

APPAREIL FRIGORIFIQUE ENCASTRABLE

Publication

EP 0935733 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97945833 A

Priority

  • DE 29618844 U
  • EP 9705667 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9819121A1] The invention relates to a built-in refrigerating apparatus (16) with a heat insulating case (17) which can be shut by a door (13). The case can be inserted and fixed in a furniture niche (14) which is enclosed by the side walls, floor and cover of the niche (12). The fixing of the heat insulating case (17) on the handle side of the door (13) is effected by means of supporting elements (20) of angle section type. Each of the supporting elements (20) on the door handle side is joined by a hinge to a covering part (30) which covers it at least partly. This covering part, which swings horizontally out of its covering position by knocking against a stopping surface (33) on the body of the furniture, determines the depth of the insertion of the built-in refrigerating apparatus (16) into the furniture niche (14).

[origin: WO9819121A1] Bei einem Einbaukältegerät (16) mit einem von einer Tür (13) verschliessbaren wärmeisolierenden Gehäuse (17), welches in eine durch seitliche Nischenwände (12), einen Nischenboden und einer Nischendecke umgrenzte Möbelnische (14) einsetzbar und darin fixierbar ist, wobei die Fixierung des wärmeisolierenden Gehäuses (17) auf der Griffseite der Tür (13) durch winkelprofilartige Halteelemente (20) bewirkt ist, ist jedes der türgriffseitigen Halteelemente (20) mit einem zumindest dieses teilweise abdeckenden Abdeckteiles (30) gelenkig verbunden, welches in aus seiner Abdeckstellung heraus verschwenktem Zustand durch Anschlagen einer Anschlagfläche (33) am Möbelkorpus die Einsetztiefe des Einbaukältegerätes (16) in die Möbelnische (14) festlegt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 23/10; A47B 95/00; E05D 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 77/08 (2006.01); F25D 23/02 (2006.01); F25D 23/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 77/08 (2013.01); F25D 23/028 (2013.01); F25D 23/10 (2013.01); F25D 2500/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29618844 U1 19970320; DK 0935733 T3 20001218; EP 0935733 A1 19990818; EP 0935733 B1 20000719; ES 2150283 T3 20001116; TR 9900784 T2 19990621; WO 9819121 A1 19980507

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091016

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110309

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091015

2011-03-22 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110310

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091015

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081024

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081021

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081029

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081027

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081031

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-06-06 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-05-31 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-11-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041101

2004-10-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041016

2003-10-22 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20031022

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-10-21 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20031021

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-18 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150283 T3

2000-09-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-09-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702072 20000824

2000-08-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

1999-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990928

1999-08-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990429

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT SE