Global Patent Index - EP 0935791 B1

EP 0935791 B1 2001-12-19 - TERMINAL FOR TAKING BETS

Title (en)

TERMINAL FOR TAKING BETS

Title (de)

ENDGERÄT ZUR SPIELANNAHME

Title (fr)

TERMINAL DE PRISE DE JEU

Publication

EP 0935791 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97943938 A

Priority

  • FR 9701757 W
  • FR 9612118 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2754371A1] The invention concerns a terminal (1) for taking bets comprising: means (2, 3) for acquiring bets; means (7) for printing data on a bet voucher; means (3, 4, 14) for controlling the validity of a voucher received; means (3, 15, 9, 4) for controlling the conformity of the printed vouchers with the data to be printed thereon; and means (12) for invalidating vouchers, arranged to be actuated under the command of control means. The invention is most applicable to popular betting games.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07C 15/00; G06F 17/60; G07B 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 3/08 (2006.01); G07B 1/02 (2006.01); G07C 15/00 (2006.01); G07F 7/04 (2006.01); G07G 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/04 (2013.01); A63F 3/081 (2013.01); G07B 1/02 (2013.01); G07C 15/005 (2013.01); G07G 5/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB PT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2754371 A1 19980410; FR 2754371 B1 19981211; AU 4559897 A 19980505; BR 9712159 A 19990831; CA 2267834 A1 19980416; CA 2267834 C 20040511; CZ 9901164 A3 19990811; DE 69709392 D1 20020131; DE 69709392 T2 20020814; EP 0935791 A1 19990818; EP 0935791 B1 20011219; ES 2169431 T3 20020701; IL 128704 D0 20000131; PT 935791 E 20020628; US 6741897 B1 20040525; WO 9815923 A1 19980416

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141004

2015-11-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20151127

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-07-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150406

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141003

2015-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141003

2015-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69709392

2015-04-14 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20150406

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20131126

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20131121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-01-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20131129

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-05-03 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MORPHO, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SAGEM SECURITE, PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 69709392

- Effective date: 20120308

2012-05-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69709392

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20120308

2009-01-30 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SAGEM SECURITE, FR

- Effective date: 20090112

2009-01-19 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SAGEM DEFENSE SECURITE, FR

- Effective date: 20081230

2009-01-14 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169431 T3

2002-06-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020313

2002-04-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020326

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69709392 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB PT

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010323

1999-08-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990330

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB PT