Global Patent Index - EP 0935935 A3

EP 0935935 A3 2000-06-28 - Improvements relating to adjustable furniture

Title (en)

Improvements relating to adjustable furniture

Title (de)

Verstellbare Möbel

Title (fr)

Meubles réglables

Publication

EP 0935935 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98310582 A

Priority

  • GB 9727230 A
  • GB 9727410 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0935935A2] A deckchair (80) is designed to be retained in erected position by means of selective engagement of its lower cross-bar (87) with one (88) of a plurality of spaced-apart channels provided in a bracket (83) fixed to each of the rear legs (84) of the deckchair. The plurality of spaced-apart channels each have an entry portion (20 to 22) and a transversely directed engagement portion (25' to 27') to ensure that the deckchair is unlikely to collapse accidentally. The invention is applicable to different kinds of furniture besides deckchairs, including sun loungers, folding tables and other folding furniture. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 4/50; A47C 4/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 4/40 (2006.01); A47C 4/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 4/40 (2013.01); A47C 4/50 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0935935 A2 19990818; EP 0935935 A3 20000628

INPADOC legal status


2001-11-28 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20010926

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB GR IT LU NL PT

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47C 4/50 A, 7A 47C 4/40 B

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB GR IT LU NL PT

1999-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI