Global Patent Index - EP 0935937 B1

EP 0935937 B1 2002-09-18 - Slatted bed base with adjustable head- and footpart of a furniture sitting or lying

Title (en)

Slatted bed base with adjustable head- and footpart of a furniture sitting or lying

Title (de)

Lattenrost mit verstellbarem Kopf- und Fussteil eines Sitz-/Liegmöbels

Title (fr)

Sommier à lattes avec partie de tête- et pied réglables d'une meuble d'assise ou de chouchage

Publication

EP 0935937 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98120952 A

Priority

DE 29802384 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0935937A1] The invention relates to furniture designed for sitting/lying, especially slatted frames, comprising adjustable elements, for example a bed with an adjustable head and foot part, where motors are provided for adjustment. The aim of the invention is to provide a solution which allows for the furniture designed for sitting/lying, especially slatted frames, to be adjustable by a motor and for the motors to remain unobtrusive. To this end the invention provides for direct-drive motors (10) integrated into swivel shafts (9) to be positioned on the frame (2) of the slatted frame (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 20/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 20/08 (2006.01); A47C 20/04 (2006.01); A47C 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 20/08 (2013.01); A47C 20/041 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29802384 U1 19980409; AT 224161 T 20021015; CN 1127928 C 20031119; CN 1255839 A 20000607; DK 0935937 T3 20030203; EP 0935937 A1 19990818; EP 0935937 B1 20020918; ES 2184188 T3 20030401; ID 23933 A 20000602; JP 2001520564 A 20011030; KR 20000076289 A 20001226; WO 9940820 A1 19990819

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *RECTICEL INTERNATIONALE BETTSYSTEME G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20041130

2006-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20041106

2005-11-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051105

2005-09-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050729

2005-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-06-27 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2005-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *RECTICEL INTERNATIONALE BETTSYSTEME G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-06 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041106

2004-11-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041105

2003-11-21 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20031121

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-21 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20031121

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20031121

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-20 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20031120

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-20 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20031120

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031118

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20031117

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031016

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-05-14 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 0935937E

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184188 T3

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020918

2003-02-03 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-12-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021219

2002-12-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805602 20021024

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224161 T 20021015

2002-06-05 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SLATTED BED BASE WITH ADJUSTABLE HEAD- AND FOOTPART OF A FURNITURE SITTING OR LYING

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020222

2000-04-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

1999-09-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990708

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

1999-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI