Global Patent Index - EP 0935941 A3

EP 0935941 A3 2000-05-10 - Shower or steam bath booth

Title (en)

Shower or steam bath booth

Title (de)

Kabine zum Duschen und/oder Dampfbaden

Title (fr)

Cabine de douche ou de bain de vapeur

Publication

EP 0935941 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99101844 A

Priority

  • DE 19805460 A
  • DE 19839650 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0935941A2] A room-side partition (7) has a wall-part (7.2) in the form of a door. The two wall-side edges of the partition are joined to side-wall parts (9,10) leading to the corner (3) of the room. The side wall-parts are joined to a transverse wall part (11) and, spaced apart from the corner of the room, form a compartment (12) for a steam generator (13). The transverse wall-part has an opening possessing a detachable cover.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/22; A61H 33/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/28 (2006.01); E04H 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/283 (2013.01); E04H 1/125 (2013.01); E04H 2001/1288 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0935941 A2 19990818; EP 0935941 A3 20000510; EP 0935941 B1 20030502; AT 238728 T 20030515

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070128

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080801

2007-01-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070119

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HOESCH METALL + KUNSTSTOFFWERK G.M.B.H. & CO.

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040128

2003-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905258 P 20030605

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE IT NL

2003-05-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47K 3/28 A

2003-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61H 33/06 B

2003-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47K 3/12 B

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020424

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001012

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE IT NL

2000-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47K 3/22 A, 7A 61H 33/06 B, 7A 47K 3/12 B, 7E 04H 1/12 B

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE IT NL

1999-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI