Global patent index - EP 0935943 A3

EP 0935943 A3 2001-04-11 - Vacuum cleaner

Title (en)

Vacuum cleaner

Title (de)

Staubsauger

Title (fr)

Aspirateur

Publication

EP 0935943 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99102552 A

Priority

DE 19806042 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0935943A2] The vacuum cleaner includes a display element activated by a switching device (14) triggered through a pressure difference between the environment and a hypotension in the dust chamber. The switching device is arranged directly on a printed circuit board (13) installed in the vacuum cleaner casing (1), and the electric connection between the switching device and the display element is provided by corresponding conductor paths. The vacuum cleaner includes a device indicating a certain condition in the vacuum cleaner, whereby an electric display element is activated by an electric switching device (14) triggered through a pressure difference between an environment pressure and a hypotension in the dust chamber (2) of the vacuum cleaner. The switching device is arranged directly on a printed circuit board (13) installed in the vacuum cleaner casing (1), and the electric connection between the switching device and the display element is provided by conductor paths of the printed circuit board.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/19; A47L 9/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/19 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/19 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0935943 A2 19990818; EP 0935943 A3 20010411; EP 0935943 B1 20070509; DE 19806042 A1 19990819; DE 59914328 D1 20070621

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160229

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20151022

2015-05-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59914328

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150402

2015-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140211

2014-09-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2013-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130219

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-04-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080212

2007-09-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-08-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2007-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59914328

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-06-21

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-05-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20070509

2007-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2007-05-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT SE

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011011

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1999-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI