Global Patent Index - EP 0936008 A4

EP 0936008 A4 2000-08-09 - NOZZLE FOR CONTINUOUS CASTING OF STEEL

Title (en)

NOZZLE FOR CONTINUOUS CASTING OF STEEL

Title (de)

GIESSDÜSE FÜR DAS STRANGGIESSEN VON STAHL

Title (fr)

AJUTAGE POUR COULAGE CONTINU D'ACIER

Publication

EP 0936008 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98914122 A

Priority

  • JP 9801825 W
  • JP 11824197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9850184A1] A nozzle for continuous casting of steel which excels in resistances to both clogging and melting loss, characterized in that the inner hole and/or the part in contact with molten steel of the nozzle for continuous casting of steel are formed of a refractory material consisting of spinel or spinel and periclase as mineral phase.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 41/54; C04B 35/443

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/10 (2006.01); B22D 41/50 (2006.01); B22D 41/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 41/54 (2013.01); B22D 41/505 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0601700 A2 19940615 - SHAW RICHARD DUDLEY [GB]
  • [PX] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 12 25 December 1997 (1997-12-25)
  • See also references of WO 9850184A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9850184 A1 19981112; AU 6855298 A 19981127; AU 714663 B2 20000106; EP 0936008 A1 19990818; EP 0936008 A4 20000809; JP 3213699 B2 20011002; JP H10305355 A 19981117

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050315

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020611

2000-08-09 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000623

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT

2000-08-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 22D 41/54 A, 7C 04B 35/443 B

1999-08-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990203

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT