Global Patent Index - EP 0936034 A3

EP 0936034 A3 2002-11-13 - Method and apparatus for cutting and separating segments from a round article

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for cutting and separating segments from a round article

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Schneiden und Vereinzeln von Segmenten aus einem runden Gegenstand

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour couper et séparer de segments à partir d'un objet rond

Publication

EP 0936034 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98123378 A

Priority

DE 19804622 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0936034A2] The cutter and separator cut and separate segments (42) from a round object (11) especially vertically. A rotarily movable sickle (27) has at least one blade (27). The separator has at least one rotarily movable ejector arm (35) especially in the form of a star with four ejector arms the end of which has a top and or bottom surface (38). The object is rotated by a rotary slide piece (23). At least one outer side of the object has sprung guides, especially in the form of cylindrical rollers (18).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 3/24; B26D 1/29; B26D 7/18; B26D 7/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/29 (2006.01); B26D 3/24 (2006.01); B26D 7/06 (2006.01); B26D 7/18 (2006.01); B26D 7/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/06 (2013.01); B26D 1/29 (2013.01); B26D 3/245 (2013.01); B26D 7/1818 (2013.01); B26D 7/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19804622 A1 19990812; AT 291527 T 20050415; EP 0936034 A2 19990818; EP 0936034 A3 20021113; EP 0936034 B1 20050323

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081208

2009-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081208

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080229

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071221

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20071224

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20071213

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-11-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-03-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051227

2006-02-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-04-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59812678 P 20050428

2005-04-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-03-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI NL

2003-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI NL

2003-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030228

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALPMA ALPENLAND MASCHINENBAU GMBH

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI