Global Patent Index - EP 0936036 A3

EP 0936036 A3 2001-04-18 - Cutting apparatus

Title (en)

Cutting apparatus

Title (de)

Schneideeinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de coupe

Publication

EP 0936036 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99200265 A

Priority

GB 9802872 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0936036A2] Apparatus for cutting an elongate strip of flexible material to a predetermined length and width has a drum for holding the strip on its outer surface by a vacuum. A first spaced pair of knives, co-operating with channels extending circumferentially of the drum, are aligned with markings on the strip to cut the strip to a predetermined width and to position the markings at a predetermined distance from the edge thereof. A second pair of channels skewed longitudinally of the drum are adjustable to set a predetermined length for the strip. The longitudinal edge of the cut strip is aligned with indicia on the strip. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 11/00; B26D 1/03; B26D 7/01; B26D 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/02 (2006.01); B26D 1/03 (2006.01); B26D 7/01 (2006.01); G03D 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/018 (2013.01); B26D 1/035 (2013.01); G03D 15/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0936036 A2 19990818; EP 0936036 A3 20010418; GB 9802872 D0 19980408; JP H11285995 A 19991019

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020528

2002-02-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020115

2002-02-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: FR GB

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010920

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 26D 11/00 A, 7B 26D 7/01 B, 7B 26D 1/03 B, 7B 26D 7/26 B

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): FR GB

1999-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI