Global Patent Index - EP 0936066 B1

EP 0936066 B1 2001-12-19 - Control device for a printing press

Title (en)

Control device for a printing press

Title (de)

Steuerung für eine Druckmachine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande pour une machine à imprimer

Publication

EP 0936066 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99102602 A

Priority

DE 19806141 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0936066A1] The controller has several units, e.g. printing mechanisms and lacquering devices, associated with at least one station (2.1-2.3) with a computer. The individual stations are connected together by a first bus (6) carrying commands. The printer has an angle sensor (4) whose signals are passed to the stations over a second bus (7). The absolute angle sensor feeds an evaluation unit (5) that extracts absolute angle values from the sensor's incremental signals. Absolute angle values are conveyed by the first bus with the machine idle. With the machine active, the values passed over the first bus with the machine idle are processed to give current actual angle setting values using the incremental signals from the second bus.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/51 (2006.01); B41F 33/00 (2006.01); B41F 33/08 (2006.01); B41F 33/14 (2006.01); B41J 19/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/0009 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0936066 A1 19990818; EP 0936066 B1 20011219; AT 211070 T 20020115; DE 19806141 A1 19990819; JP 2000037858 A 20000208; JP 3040391 B2 20000515

INPADOC legal status


2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2007-02-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070216

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-12-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040211

2004-02-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040211

2004-02-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040211

2003-02-06 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030206

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-02-05 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030205

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030130

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900562 20020131

2002-01-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011231

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211070 T 20020115

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010523

2000-04-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB

1999-08-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990609

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

1999-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI