Global Patent Index - EP 0936072 A3

EP 0936072 A3 2000-07-12 - Wiper structure

Title (en)

Wiper structure

Title (de)

Wischerstruktur

Title (fr)

Structure de balai

Publication

EP 0936072 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99250026 A

Priority

JP 1234098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0936072A2] The present invention provides a wiper structure capable of reducing parts costs as well as uniformly cleaning away. The wiper structure includes a spatula-shaped ink absorption/holding body (7) causing the capillary phenomenon and having on its one surface an absorption-reduced wall (7a ) having reduced ink absorption ability. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/165

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/165 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/16538 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0936072 A2 19990818; EP 0936072 A3 20000712; CN 1202958 C 20050525; CN 1231968 A 19991020; JP 3184143 B2 20010709; JP H11207976 A 19990803

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030801

2002-07-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FUJI XEROX CO., LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI