Global Patent Index - EP 0936080 A3

EP 0936080 A3 2000-07-05 - Process for decorating skis or similar

Title (en)

Process for decorating skis or similar

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Dekorieren von Ski od.dgl

Title (fr)

Procédé de décoration de skis ou similaires

Publication

EP 0936080 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99890045 A

Priority

AT 24898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0936080A2] The method involves printing onto a flat substrate (1) and joining the substrate to the object, printing onto a substrate already joined to the object or printing onto a pre-substrate and transferring the print to a substrate already joined or yet to be joined to the object. A digital printing technique is used to print at least the motif (3), and can also be used for the background.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 7/00; G03G 8/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 7/00 (2006.01); G03G 8/00 (2006.01); B41M 5/00 (2006.01); B41M 5/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 8/00 (2013.01); B41M 7/0027 (2013.01); B41M 5/52 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0936080 A2 19990818; EP 0936080 A3 20000705; EP 0936080 B1 20040915; AT 406340 B 20000425; AT A24898 A 19990915; DE 59910474 D1 20041021

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160224

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160225

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-10-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-09-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-04-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2004-12-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910474 P 20041021

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FI FR IT LI SE

2004-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-09-15 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-09-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040915

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030327

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FI FR IT LI SE

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001221

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FI FR IT LI SE

1999-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI