Global Patent Index - EP 0936123 A3

EP 0936123 A3 2000-05-17 - Carrier wagon for the transport of containers or interchangeable containers on the railway network

Title (en)

Carrier wagon for the transport of containers or interchangeable containers on the railway network

Title (de)

Behältertragwagen zum Transport von Containern oder Wechselbehältern auf dem Eisenbahnnetz

Title (fr)

Wagon porteur pour le transport de conteneurs ou de conteneurs interchangeables sur le réseau ferroviaire

Publication

EP 0936123 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99101246 A

Priority

DE 19805429 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CZ291256B6] The present invention relates to a wagon for the transport of containers or interchangeable containers on the railway network has an undercarriage (2) that is arranged on two swiveling bogies (4) provided with wheels (3), and which has two outer longitudinal beams (5) being coupled with each other by means of transverse beams (6), whereby the outer longitudinal beams (5) outward curved projections (7) at the region of the wheel bogies (4). Next to the projections (7), there are performed recesses (8) where the wheels (3) can be accommodated during rotation and swing movements, whereby the wheels (3) are positioned in succession within the recesses (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61F 1/10; B61D 3/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61F 1/10 (2006.01); B61D 3/16 (2006.01); B61D 3/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 3/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19805429 A1 19990812; AT 312741 T 20051215; CZ 291256 B6 20030115; CZ 9900438 A3 19990915; DE 59912907 D1 20060119; EP 0936123 A2 19990818; EP 0936123 A3 20000517; EP 0936123 B1 20051214; NO 319564 B1 20050829; NO 990629 A 19990812; NO 990629 D0 19990210; PL 194491 B1 20070629; PL 331399 A1 19990816; RO 117780 B1 20020730

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160201

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160802

2016-10-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160930

2016-08-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59912907

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150108

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150114

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-03-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59912907

- Representative's name: LUEDTKE, FRANK, DIPL.-ING., DE

2015-01-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130123

2013-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: WAGGONBAU GRAAFF GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: WAGGONBAU ELZE GMBH & CO. BESITZ KG, 31008 ELZE, DE

- Document: DE 59912907

- Effective date: 20130820

2013-10-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59912907

- Representative's name: LUEDTKE, FRANK, DIPL.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20130820

2013-10-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59912907

- Representative's name: LUEDTKE, FRANK, DIPL.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20130130

2013-09-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 312741 T

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-08-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-08-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59912907

- Representative's name: LUEDTKE, FRANK, DIPL.-ING., DE

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120126

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59912907

- Representative's name: LUEDTKE, FRANK, DIPL.-ING., DE

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120127

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120126

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-13 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-06-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: WAGGONBAU GRAAFF GMBH

- Free text: WAGGONBAU ELZE GMBH & CO. BESITZ KG#HEINRICH-NAGEL-STRASSE 1#31008 ELZE (DE) -TRANSFER TO- WAGGONBAU GRAAFF GMBH#HEINRICH-NAGEL-STRASSE 1#31008 ELZE (DE)

2009-02-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080123

2008-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080123

2008-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *WAGGONBAU ELZE G.M.B.H. & CO. BESITZ K.G.

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-01-02 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070320

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-20 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070320

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-01-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070117

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-11-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060915

2006-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-03-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060325

2006-03-14 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060314

2006-03-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060314

2006-03-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060208

2006-01-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912907 P 20060119

2005-12-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2005-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-12-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2005-12-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-12-14 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051214

2005-01-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041126

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001114

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI