Global Patent Index - EP 0936125 A3

EP 0936125 A3 2000-03-22 - Tracking method for axle assemblies of a railway vehicle and device for carrying out this method

Title (en)

Tracking method for axle assemblies of a railway vehicle and device for carrying out this method

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Spurführung von Achseinheiten eines Schienenfahrzeugs und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Méthode de guidage de voie pour ensembles d'essieux d'un véhicule ferroviaire et dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre de cette méthode

Publication

EP 0936125 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99102259 A

Priority

DE 19805268 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0936125A2] The method involves introducing a relative moment between the two wheels (1'l,1'r) of each axle unit to influence the relative revolution rate and setting different active, semi-active or passive characteristics using a controller. The half shafts of at least one axle unit are the shafts of electric motors (70l,70r) used for the drive and controlled to superimpose the relative moment An Independent claim is also included for an arrangement for implementing the method.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61F 5/38; B61C 9/52; B61C 15/14; B61F 3/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61F 3/16 (2006.01); B61F 5/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61F 3/16 (2013.01); B61F 5/383 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19805268 C1 19990812; EP 0936125 A2 19990818; EP 0936125 A3 20000322

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021005

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020325

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR LI

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 61F 5/38 A, 7B 61F 3/16 B, 7B 61C 9/52 B, 7B 61C 15/14 B

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI

1999-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI