Global Patent Index - EP 0936167 A3

EP 0936167 A3 2000-05-31 - Roller pair

Title (en)

Roller pair

Title (de)

Walzenpaar

Title (fr)

Paire de rouleaux

Publication

EP 0936167 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99100665 A

Priority

DE 29802400 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0936167A2] The periphery of the bottom roll (5) incorporates a sensor (20), outside the zone touched by the textile fabric (10) in normal operation. The sensor responds to the presence of the textile fabric. The signal of the sensor is used to prevent the entering of the fabric, guided along the roll periphery, into the roll gap (6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 26/00; D06B 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 26/00 (2006.01); D06B 15/02 (2006.01); F26B 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 26/00 (2013.01); D06B 15/02 (2013.01); F26B 13/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29802400 U1 19990610; EP 0936167 A2 19990818; EP 0936167 A3 20000531

INPADOC legal status


2001-12-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-10-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001201

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI