Global Patent Index - EP 0936176 B1

EP 0936176 B1 2002-09-04 - Car jack

Title (en)

Car jack

Title (de)

Wagenheber

Title (fr)

Cric de véhicule

Publication

EP 0936176 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99100059 A

Priority

DE 19804334 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0936176A1] The leg (1) is supported on the ground (5) by a foot (4). A support plate (19) is on the end of the support arm (2) and swivels by means of another link (18). The support plate lifts the vehicle by means of a support part (20) and has a stop for the bodywork (25) with an upward bent arm (26). Control arms (9,10) connected to the leg, to the support arm and to each other form a parallelogram with the leg and support arm. The end (17) of the support arm protrudes beyond the link (7) with the control arm joined to it. A spindle (12) is joined to the link (11) between the control arms, and to the link (3) between the leg and support arm. The control arm joined to the support arm has a spring (28) which extends beyond the end of the control arm towards the connection of the points of gravity (7,11) of the control arm. The end of the spring supports the underside of the bodywork stop of the support plate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66F 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60S 9/02 (2006.01); B60S 9/14 (2006.01); B66F 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 3/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES

EPO simple patent family

EP 0936176 A1 19990818; EP 0936176 B1 20020904; BR 9900532 A 20010320; CZ 291192 B6 20030115; CZ 9900394 A3 19990811; DE 19804334 A1 19990819; DE 19804334 C2 20030528; ES 2178308 T3 20021216; US 6070856 A 20000606; ZA 9900893 B 19990805

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150801

2015-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59902508

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140122

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110106

2012-03-20 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: BRANO WAGENHEBER GMBH

- Effective date: 20120307

2012-02-20 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120220

2011-12-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BRANO WAGENHEBER GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: THYSSENKRUPP BILSTEIN WAGENHEBER GMBH, 54429 MANDERN, DE

- Document: DE 59902508

- Effective date: 20111026

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100226

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2002-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2178308 T3

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902508 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES

2002-09-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES

2002-08-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP BILSTEIN GMBH

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020315

2000-04-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT PT

1999-09-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990713

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT

1999-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI