Global Patent Index - EP 0936288 A3

EP 0936288 A3 2000-06-07 - A process for producing colour variations on electrolytically pigmented anodized aluminium

Title (en)

A process for producing colour variations on electrolytically pigmented anodized aluminium

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Farbevariationen auf elektrolytisch pigmentiertem, anodisiertem Aluminium

Title (fr)

Procédé pour produire des variations de couleur sur de l'aluminium anodisé et pigmenté par voie électrolytique

Publication

EP 0936288 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98811275 A

Priority

US 403598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0936288A2] A process for producing a coloured article of anodized aluminium or aluminium alloy, wherein an anodized aluminium or aluminium alloy article (A), which is electrolytically pigmented with a metallic pigment (B) within the anodically produced oxide layer, is treated with a solution (C) comprising metal cations of a species other than that of said metallic pigment (B), until a perceivable colour conversion has taken place, and sealed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25D 11/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 11/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 11/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0936288 A2 19990818; EP 0936288 A3 20000607; AU 1002799 A 19990729; CA 2258370 A1 19990707; JP H11256394 A 19990921

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011009

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010528

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000928

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1999-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI