Global Patent Index - EP 0936293 A3

EP 0936293 A3 2000-09-27 - Apparatus for removing impurities in an open-end spinning machine

Title (en)

Apparatus for removing impurities in an open-end spinning machine

Title (de)

Schmutzentsorgungseinrichtung für eine Offenend-Spinnmaschine

Title (fr)

Appareil pour l'évacuation d'impuretés dans une machine de filature à bout ouvert

Publication

EP 0936293 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99102009 A

Priority

  • DE 19805235 A
  • DE 19827610 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6116011A] An open-end spinning machine (1) with a plurality of adjacent open-end spinning units (2) each having a sliver opening device (4) with impurity-discharge openings (10). An impurity-removal device (11) is installed below the impurity-discharge openings (10) and comprises an impurity-removal belt (12) which can be driven in a reciprocating manner. A cleaning carriage (16) is arranged on the impurity-removal belt (12) and is connected by frictional engagement to the impurity-removal belt (12). The cleaning carriage (16) has a cleaning lip (18) which mechanically cleans the areas of the sliver opening devices (4) especially endangered by contamination. The cleaning carriage (12) can be shifted as required relative to the impurity-removal belt (12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 4/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 4/30 (2006.01); D01H 4/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 4/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6116011 A 20000912; CZ 297619 B6 20070214; CZ 9900421 A3 19990811; EP 0936293 A2 19990818; EP 0936293 A3 20000927; EP 0936293 B1 20040421; JP H11279852 A 19991012

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170227

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-11-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SAURER GERMANY GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OERLIKON TEXTILE GMBH & CO. KG, 42897 REMSCHEID, DE

- Document: DE 59909213

- Effective date: 20130918

2007-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2006-02-20 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060220

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050124

2005-04-08 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-05-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909213 P 20040527

2004-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2004-04-21 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040421

2003-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021108

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR IT LI

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010327

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

1999-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI