Global Patent Index - EP 0936294 A3

EP 0936294 A3 2000-04-05 - Method for making knitwear on a flat bed knitting machine

Title (en)

Method for making knitwear on a flat bed knitting machine

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Gestricks auf einer Flachstrickmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication d'un tricot dans un métier à tricoter rectiligne

Publication

EP 0936294 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98123873 A

Priority

DE 19801643 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19801643A1] To knit a fabric on a flatbed knitter, using a simultaneous feed of two yarns (11,12) of different elasticity, for each stitch to be knitted at a needle the length to be fed of the yarn (12) with the higher elasticity is computed from the length required of the yarn (11) with the lower elasticity together with data giving the stretch characteristics of the more elastic yarn (12). The data for the higher stretch yarn (12) characteristics are used to compute a retarding factor to multiply the length of the less elastic yarn (11) to maintain the feed length of the higher stretch yarn (12). More higher stretch yarn (12) is delivered when the knitting direction for it is away from the yarn feed (21) than when it is towards the feed. The measured feed length of the lower stretch yarn (11) is given by a monitor (15). The fed length of the lower stretch yarn (11) is computed from data generated by a machine control for each stitch size and the number of stitches in the row. The two yarns (11,12) are fed to the knitter by a combined yarn guide (FF). An Independent claim is included for a flatbed knitter, with a bobbin (13) for the lower stretch yarn (11), and a feed (21) for the higher stretch yarn (12), and a common yarn guide (FF) for both yarns (11,12). A machine control (19) and computer unit (17) determine the length to be fed of the yarn (12) with higher elasticity, and control the yarn feed (21) accordingly. The yarn feed (21) unit preferably has two parallel feed rollers (23), rotating in the same direction, supporting the bobbin (24) wound with the higher stretch yarn (12). The feed (21) has a motor (22) coupled to the computer and control unit (17). A yarn tensioner (14), for the lower stretch yarn (11), is between its bobbin (13) and the yarn guide (FF). The monitor (15) to measure the length of the lower stretch yarn (11) is between its bobbin (13) and the yarn guide (FF), and is linked to the computer and control unit (17). A yarn break sensor (25) monitors the feed of the yarn (12) with the higher elasticity.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 1/22; D04B 15/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 59/38 (2006.01); D04B 1/18 (2006.01); D04B 15/38 (2006.01); D04B 15/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/50 (2013.01); B65H 59/387 (2013.01); D04B 15/44 (2013.01); D04B 15/80 (2013.01); B65H 2701/319 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19801643 A1 19990722; CN 1224086 A 19990728; CN 1265046 C 20060719; EP 0936294 A2 19990818; EP 0936294 A3 20000405; EP 0936294 B1 20030319; ES 2190566 T3 20030801; HK 1021554 A1 20070105; US 6170301 B1 20010109

INPADOC legal status


2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121216

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101123

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061218

2008-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061218

2006-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2005-12-16 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051216

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-01-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050110

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2190566 T3

2003-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807554 P 20030424

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES IT

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

1999-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI