Global Patent Index - EP 0936296 A3

EP 0936296 A3 2000-06-14 - Method and apparatus for dyeing a textile fabric by the cold pad-batch process

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for dyeing a textile fabric by the cold pad-batch process

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anlage zum Färben einer textilen Warenbahn nach dem Kalt-Klotz-Verweilverfahren

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour la teinture d' une étoffe textile selon le procédé de foulardage avec séjour à froid

Publication

EP 0936296 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99101184 A

Priority

DE 19805840 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19805840C1] For dyeing fabric piece goods, after winding the wet and dyed material (10) into a roll. The final layer of the batch (12) is covered by at least one winding (21) of a plastics film web (20) by the same winding apparatus (6), to shroud the batch (12). The leading end of the winding (21) is bonded tightly to the film web (20), by welding, and separated from the following film web material (20). In an Independent claim an assembly has a supply roll (15) of plastics film (20) at the fabric winder (6), which draws a winding (21) of the film (20) round the wound fabric batch (12). Units weld the end of the film and cut the wound film length. Preferred Features: The film supply roll (15) is near the pressure roller (13) at the winder arms (8). The end of the film (20) is fed through the winding gap (16) in a winding (21) round the batch (12). A welding beam (17) bonds the film end, at the ends of swing arms (18) which pivot on the winding arms (8). A cutter is at the swing arms (18) to sever the film after welding.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06B 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06B 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06B 17/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] GB 1369671 A 19741009 - COTTON INC
  • [DA] DE 4408416 A1 19950914 - KUESTERS EDUARD MASCHF [DE]
  • [A] G. DIERKES: "Neuartiges Kalt-Klotz-Baum-Färbeverfahren für Baumwolle", CHEMIEFASERN/TEXTILINDUSTRIE, vol. 33/85, May 1983 (1983-05-01), Frankfurt am Main, DE, pages 322, XP002135374

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19805840 C1 19990512; EP 0936296 A2 19990818; EP 0936296 A3 20000614; US 6138308 A 20001031

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030115

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000613

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

1999-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI