Global Patent Index - EP 0936301 A3

EP 0936301 A3 2000-02-23 - Apparatus for feeding a fibre suspension on a dewatering device

Title (en)

Apparatus for feeding a fibre suspension on a dewatering device

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Zufuhr einer Faserstoffsuspension auf eine Entwässerungseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Appareil pour l' alimentation d' une suspension de fibres sur un dispositif d' essorage

Publication

EP 0936301 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98124784 A

Priority

AT 20698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0936301A2] The stock inlet to deliver fiber pulp to the water removal section of a papermaking machine, and especially for tissue paper, has at least one dividing wall (8) for a stock inlet, with two or more layers. A rigid and one-piece steel wedge-shaped blade (12) is bonded to the dividing wall. The blade is tensed against the dividing wall (8) by a tie rod (13). An eccentric adjusts the setting of the dividing wall and blade unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/02 (2006.01); D21F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/02 (2013.01); D21F 1/028 (2013.01); D21F 9/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0936301 A2 19990818; EP 0936301 A3 20000223; EP 0936301 B1 20031126; AT 406171 B 20000327; AT A20698 A 19990715; BR 9900531 A 20000222; DE 59810270 D1 20040108; ES 2210654 T3 20040701; US 6368464 B1 20020409

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141230

2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121230

2014-03-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140307

2014-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20131219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121229

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121229

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-10-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59810270

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-08-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121229

2013-08-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121229

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20111227

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20111222

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20111227

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20111214

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-12-03 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-11-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040827

2004-08-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2210654 T3

2004-03-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040223

2004-03-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-01-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040116

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810270 P 20040108

2003-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-11-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

2003-11-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-26 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031126

2002-02-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020115

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

2000-10-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ANDRITZ AG

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000317

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

1999-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI