Global patent index - EP 0936307 A3

EP 0936307 A3 2000-05-24 - Drying section and method of operating such a drying section

Title (en)

Drying section and method of operating such a drying section

Title (de)

Trockenpartie sowie Verfahren zum Betreiben einer solchen Trockenpartie

Title (fr)

Section de séchage et procédé de fonctionnement d' une telle section de séchage

Publication

EP 0936307 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98123743 A

Priority

DE 19805723 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0936307A2] During the operation of a web drying section of a papermaking machine, the shrinkage in the web (12) across the direction of web travel is set or controlled so that at least one and preferably several zones give a free and unimpeded shrinkage in the web (12). During the operation of a web drying section of a papermaking machine, the shrinkage in the web (12) across the direction of web travel is set or controlled so that at least one and preferably several zones give a free and unimpeded shrinkage in the web (12). The lateral shrinkage of the web (12) is controlled by the number of zones with a free shrinkage and/or the position within the drying section (10). A free web shrinkage zone is established at least in the trailing part of at least one drying group (14), in the direction of web travel, and at least in a trailing zone of the drying section (10). The lateral shrinkage is controlled so that a generally flat shrinkage development is formed across the web and especially at the edges of the web. An Independent claim is included for a drying section (10) at a papermaking machine with a fourdrinier (22) to support the web (12) at least at an initial zone of the drying section (10), where the web and fourdrinier pass through together. The web (12), when detached from the fourdrinier (22), is supported by a gas cushion round the web guide (20) without physical contact and/or the web is blown clear of the fourdrinier by a gas medium, to give a zone where the web can shrink freely. A further Independent claim is included for a roller with a drilled and perforated roller mantle, with the main roller zone connected to a compressed air supply. The perforations at the end zones can be linked selectively to the compressed air or a vacuum. The perforations in the main and end roller zones are separated by a dividing wall, or a moving slide is used to block some perforations and leave others free, while opening and closing the connection to the vacuum source.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/042 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0936307 A2 19990818; EP 0936307 A3 20000524; DE 19805723 A1 19990819; US 6145218 A 20001114

INPADOC legal status

2004-06-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031205

2003-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030724

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FI SE

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001124

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

1999-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI