Global Patent Index - EP 0936312 A3

EP 0936312 A3 2000-08-30 - Accessible and/or practicable device

Title (en)

Accessible and/or practicable device

Title (de)

Begeh- und/oder befahrbare Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif accessible et/ou praticable

Publication

EP 0936312 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99102113 A

Priority

DE 19806145 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0936312A2] The footbridge or traffic bridge structure, such as for installation over and/or under roads, has a section (1) composed of a number of planks, bonded by lateral members (2) with handrails and/or an upper level (3). A lateral member (2) is at least partially in a box profile. A side cladding is clamped between the lateral members (2). A tie rod is between lateral members to link the lower and upper levels (1,3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01D 6/00; E01D 1/00; E01D 19/02; E01D 19/10; E01D 101/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01D 1/00 (2006.01); E01D 6/00 (2006.01); E01D 19/02 (2006.01); E01D 19/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01D 6/00 (2013.01); E01D 1/00 (2013.01); E01D 19/02 (2013.01); E01D 19/103 (2013.01); E01D 2101/34 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0936312 A2 19990818; EP 0936312 A3 20000830; DE 19806145 A1 19990819; US 6182319 B1 20010206

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031002

2001-06-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-06-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

1999-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI