Global Patent Index - EP 0936316 A3

EP 0936316 A3 2000-02-02 - Mineral barrier, especially for use as barrier over or under refuse dumps

Title (en)

Mineral barrier, especially for use as barrier over or under refuse dumps

Title (de)

Mineralische Abdichtung, insbesondere zur Verwendung als deponiebasisabdichtung oder als Deponieoberflächenabdichtung

Title (fr)

Etanchement minéral, particulièrement pour l'usage dans des sites de décharge

Publication

EP 0936316 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99250043 A

Priority

DE 19806340 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0936316A2] The mineral seal (2) has a layer (4) of a waterproof mineral extending lateral in a sealed plane. A moistening aggregate system and a humidity sensor element (8) extend parallel to the sealed plane. The moistening aggregate system is regulated according to a comparison of values measured by the sensor element with predetermined nominal values of the humidity. The is composed of at least one layer (4) of a waterproof mineral material extending lateral in a sealed plane. A moistening aggregate system extends parallel to the sealed plane. A sensor element (8) extends parallel to the sealed plane for measuring at least a degree of humidity. The moistening aggregate system is arranged above, within, or directly underneath the seal, and the sensor element is arranged within the seal. The moistening aggregate system is regulated according to a comparison of values measured by the sensor element with predetermined nominal values of the humidity.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 31/00 (2013.01); E02D 2200/17 (2013.01); E02D 2300/0085 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0936316 A2 19990818; EP 0936316 A3 20000202; DE 19806340 A1 19990826; DE 19806340 C2 20000831

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050901

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040325

2001-01-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-12-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-10 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: REIDICK, HUBERT

1999-11-10 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: GLOETZL GESELLSCHAFT FUER BAUMESSTECHNIK MBH

1999-11-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: REIDICK, HUBERT

1999-08-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990212

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI