Global Patent Index - EP 0936329 A3

EP 0936329 A3 2000-04-26 - Transportable heater

Title (en)

Transportable heater

Title (de)

Transportables Heizgerät

Title (fr)

Appareil de chauffage transportable

Publication

EP 0936329 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99102679 A

Priority

DE 29802380 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0936329A2] The heating apparatus (4) comprises a holding means (6) for its handling, with an operating stopping means (7) to stop the heating apparatus, and at least one through- channel (24) in which a motor-driven suction pump (25) is switched on. The suction side has placeable liquid-inlets (22) whilst the pressure side has communicating liquid outlets (23) of the through channel. There is a heater (27) in the channel for heating conveyed liquid from the suction pump through the channel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 4/12; F24H 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 4/12 (2006.01); F24H 1/06 (2006.01); F24H 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 1/06 (2013.01); E04H 4/129 (2013.01); F24H 1/08 (2013.01); F24H 1/225 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29902504 U1 19990617; DE 29802380 U1 19980430; EP 0936329 A2 19990818; EP 0936329 A3 20000426

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020424

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011213

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE FR GB LI LU NL

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001026

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI LU NL

1999-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI