EP 0936354 A3 20010808 - Electronic control device
Title (en)
Electronic control device
Title (de)
Elektronische Regeleinrichtung
Title (fr)
Dispositif de régulation éléctronique
Publication
Application
Priority
DE 19805299 A 19980210
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP0936354A2] The fuel injection regulation device uses a setting element for adjusting a fuel pump regulating rod for altering the fuel injection quantity, under control of a control unit (2) receiving input signals from a number of sensors for different operating parameters, configured for matching different types of engine and/or engine applications. Also included are Independent claims for the following: (a) an adjustment method for an electronic fuel regulation device; (b) an over-revving control method using an electronic fuel injection regulation device; (c) an engine torque control method using an electronic fuel injection regulation device; (d) a proportional gradient control method for an electronic fuel injection regulation device; (e) a fuel injection quantity control method using an electronic fuel injection regulation device; (f) an engine starting method using an electronic fuel injection regulation device
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
F02D 41/38 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
F02D 41/38 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [Y] EP 0325960 A2 19890802 - OPEL ADAM AG [DE]
- [A] US 5531200 A 19960702 - HOSOE KATSUHARU [JP], et al
- [A] DE 4326327 A1 19940929 - DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]
- [XAY] US 4493303 A 19850115 - THOMPSON LIONEL D [US], et al
- [YA] US 5417193 A 19950523 - FILLMAN ALAN R [US], et al
- [YA] DE 2042914 A1 19720302 - BOSCH GMBH ROBERT
- [Y] DE 3105856 A1 19820902 - BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]
- [A] US 4787352 A 19881129 - ANDERSON GEORGE [US]
- [A] EP 0333702 A2 19890920 - VOEST ALPINE AUTOMOTIVE [AT]
- [A] DE 3832567 A1 19900329 - BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]
- [A] US 5647317 A 19970715 - WEISMAN II S MILLER [US], et al
- [A] EP 0814391 A1 19971229 - SAME DEUTZ FAHR SPA [IT]
- [A] DE 3405495 A1 19850822 - BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]
- [A] DE 4017141 A1 19911205 - KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG [DE]
- [A] DE 4019187 A1 19901220 - GEN MOTORS CORP [US]
- [A] DE 3134632 A1 19830310 - BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]
- [DY] "Diesel-Einspritztechnik", 1993, BOSCH (VDI-VERLAG), DÜSSELDORF, XP002158887
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 360 (M - 541) 3 December 1986 (1986-12-03)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 057 (M - 363) 13 March 1985 (1985-03-13)
- [A] SEHER D: "DIESEL-EINSPRITZUNG FUER WENIGER EMISSIONEN BEI NUTZFAHRZEUGMOTOREN", MTZ MOTORTECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT,DE,FRANCKH'SCHE VERLAGSHANDLUNG,ABTEILUNG TECHNIK. STUTTGART, 1992, pages 31 - 33, XP000324305, ISSN: 0024-8525
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 01 31 January 1996 (1996-01-31)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DE 19805299 A1 19990812; EP 0936354 A2 19990818; EP 0936354 A3 20010808; US 6161524 A 20001219
DOCDB simple family (application)
DE 19805299 A 19980210; EP 99102220 A 19990202; US 24567399 A 19990208