Global Patent Index - EP 0936401 A3

EP 0936401 A3 2001-03-28 - Dipped and main beam headlamp for vehicle

Title (en)

Dipped and main beam headlamp for vehicle

Title (de)

Scheinwerfer für Fahrzeuge für Abblendlicht und Fernlicht

Title (fr)

Projecteur croisement-route pour véhicule

Publication

EP 0936401 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98122225 A

Priority

DE 19805660 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0936401A2] The automobile headlamp has a light source (16) displaced along the optical axis (11) relative to a rear reflector (10) via a setting element (46) and moved vertically between a main headlamp beam position and a dipped headlamp beam position, with a pair of light stops ( 32) positioned on opposite the sides of the light source for defining the upper limit of the beam in the dipped headlamp beam position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21M 3/22; F21M 3/10; F21M 3/14; H01J 61/35

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/10 (2006.01); F21V 11/16 (2006.01); F21V 14/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/1742 (2013.01); F21S 48/1186 (2013.01); F21S 48/145 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0936401 A2 19990818; EP 0936401 A3 20010328; EP 0936401 B1 20051207; DE 19805660 A1 19990819; DE 59813262 D1 20060112

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051207

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070126

2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2007-01-26 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-11-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060908

2006-01-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59813262 P 20060112

2005-12-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2005-12-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051207

2005-07-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 21V 14/02 A

2005-07-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 21V 11/00 B

2005-07-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 21S 8/10 B

2005-07-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01J 61/35 B

2004-08-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AUTOMOTIVE LIGHTING REUTLINGEN GMBH

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010928

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21M 3/22 A, 7F 21M 3/14 B, 7F 21M 3/10 B, 7H 01J 61/35 B

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1999-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI