Global Patent Index - EP 0936407 A3

EP 0936407 A3 2000-02-09 - Gas burner for cooking range

Title (en)

Gas burner for cooking range

Title (de)

Gasbrenner für Kochstellen

Title (fr)

Brûleur à gaz pour une plaque de cuisson

Publication

EP 0936407 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99101665 A

Priority

DE 19805560 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0936407A2] The gas burner has a gas/air mixing chamber (2) and an ignition chamber (12). One of the gas nozzles serves as an ignition nozzle (10) and connects the mixing chamber with the ignition chamber. At least one air intake channel (30) is provided, which ends between the ignition nozzle and an ignition device (14, 16) in the ignition chamber, so that the mixture stream of the ignition nozzle takes in air through the air intake channel and leads along the ignition device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 14/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/06 (2013.01); F23D 2207/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19805560 A1 19990812; AT 242857 T 20030615; EP 0936407 A2 19990818; EP 0936407 A3 20000209; EP 0936407 B1 20030611; ES 2200413 T3 20040301

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170204

2017-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59905898

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160229

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Effective date: 20151022

2015-06-02 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Effective date: 20150527

2015-05-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH, 81739 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59905898

- Effective date: 20150402

2015-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100204

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2200413 T3

2004-01-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2003-11-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031021

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905898 P 20030717

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010410

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

1999-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI