Global Patent Index - EP 0936408 A3

EP 0936408 A3 2000-02-09 - Gas burner for cooking range

Title (en)

Gas burner for cooking range

Title (de)

Gasbrenner für Kochstellen

Title (fr)

Brûleur à gaz pour une plaque de cuisson

Publication

EP 0936408 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99101666 A

Priority

DE 19805559 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0936408A2] The gas burner has a gas/air mixing chamber (2) and an ignition chamber (12). One of the gas nozzles serves as an ignition nozzle (10) and connects the mixing chamber with the ignition chamber, so that its gas/air mixture stream is ignited automatically by an ignition device (14, 16) if the gas burner is switched on. The nozzle channel of the ignition nozzle is expanded at least over a partial length in flow direction, so that its mixture stream is expanded radially.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 14/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/06 (2013.01); F23D 2207/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19805559 A1 19990812; AT 225921 T 20021015; EP 0936408 A2 19990818; EP 0936408 A3 20000209; EP 0936408 B1 20021009; ES 2185254 T3 20030416

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170220

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170228

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Effective date: 20151022

2015-06-02 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Effective date: 20150527

2015-05-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH, 81739 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59902991

- Effective date: 20150402

2015-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100204

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-10-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030710

2003-05-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2185254 T3

2002-11-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902991 20021114

2002-10-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021009

2002-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2002-10-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 225921 T 20021015

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010411

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

1999-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI