Global Patent Index - EP 0936410 A3

EP 0936410 A3 2000-10-11 - Built-in cooking hob with fastening means

Title (en)

Built-in cooking hob with fastening means

Title (de)

Einbaukochfeld mit Befestigungsmitteln

Title (fr)

Plaque de cuisson encastrable avec moyens de fixation

Publication

EP 0936410 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99101664 A

Priority

DE 19805793 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19805793C1] The cooking hob frame (13) has a keyhole shaped mounting opening (21). The connector (15) has a support nose (15) and an opposed key-shaped lug (25) passing through the mounting opening. The hob frame has stop lugs (33,35) to limit rotation of the connector in the mounting opening.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/10; A47B 77/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/108 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19805793 C1 19990408; AT 251292 T 20031015; EP 0936410 A2 19990818; EP 0936410 A3 20001011; EP 0936410 B1 20031001; ES 2209252 T3 20040616

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170220

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170228

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170220

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Effective date: 20151022

2015-06-02 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Effective date: 20150527

2015-05-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH, 81739 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59907140

- Effective date: 20150402

2015-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130901

2013-10-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-10-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 251292 T

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-09-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130901

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120220

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120224

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-09-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-07-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2209252 T3

2004-04-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2004-01-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2003-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907140 P 20031106

2003-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR NL

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR NL

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR NL

1999-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI