Global Patent Index - EP 0936411 A3

EP 0936411 A3 2000-04-12 - Assembly system for glass-ceramic cooking plates

Title (en)

Assembly system for glass-ceramic cooking plates

Title (de)

Montagesystem für Glaskeramik-kochplatten

Title (fr)

Système de montage pour plaques de cuisson en verre-céramique

Publication

EP 0936411 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99500019 A

Priority

ES 9800278 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0936411A2] Assembly system for cooking glass-ceramic plates, being of the kind of those cooking plates that have a frame which acts as a support of the whole of the plate and besides as a beautifying element in its fitting into the cavity of the piece of fumiture where it is installed, and characterized because the frame (1) has the means for the subjection of a tray (4) for the assembly of the heating elements and the rest of components, and the means of support of the ceramic glass (5) and the means of tightness of the frame (1) in relationship to the piece of fumiture (6) and to the own ceramic glass (5). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/10 (2006.01); H05B 3/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/108 (2013.01); H05B 3/74 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0936411 A2 19990818; EP 0936411 A3 20000412; ES 2156661 A1 20010701; ES 2156661 B1 20020216

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040211

2003-01-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021126

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB GR IT NL SE

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000912

2000-05-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BALAY, S.A.

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT NL SE

1999-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI