Global patent index - EP 0936432 A4

EP 0936432 A4 2000-01-19 - HEAT EXCHANGER FOR AIR CONDITIONERS

Title (en)

HEAT EXCHANGER FOR AIR CONDITIONERS

Title (de)

WÄRMETAUSCHER FÜR KLIMAANLAGE

Title (fr)

ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR POUR CONDITIONNEURS D'AIR

Publication

EP 0936432 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97944133 A

Priority

  • JP 9703729 W
  • JP 30734296 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0936432A1] In a heat exchanger for use in an air conditioner or the like, a plurality of fins (10) are provided in parallel, and a plurality of upwind heat transfer tubes (13) and a plurality of downwind heat transfer tubes (14) penetrate the fins (10). Both the upwind heat transfer tubes and the downwind heat transfer tubes (13, 14) are arranged in respective rows in approximately identical directions and in a staggered form as a whole. Cut lines (15) are provided between the upwind heat transfer tubes (13) and the downwind heat transfer tubes (14). The cut lines (15) are arranged in a direction identical to the direction in which the heat transfer tubes (13, 14) are aligned, and extended in a direction intersecting the direction (X) of arrangement thereof. With this arrangement, a sufficient rigidity of the fins is secured while preventing the unnecessary heat conduction via the fins. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 1/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28F 3/00 (2006.01); F25B 39/00 (2006.01); F28D 1/047 (2006.01); F28F 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/0477 (2013.01); F28F 1/325 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB GR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0936432 A1 19990818; EP 0936432 A4 20000119; EP 0936432 B1 20030108; AU 4573197 A 19980522; AU 710016 B2 19990909; CN 1159564 C 20040728; CN 1228833 A 19990915; DE 69718343 D1 20030213; DE 69718343 T2 20030918; ES 2190544 T3 20030801; HK 1019354 A1 20030829; JP H10132480 A 19980522; KR 20000034784 A 20000626; MY 118256 A 20040930; PT 936432 E 20030331; TW 415582 U 20001211; WO 9819126 A1 19980507

INPADOC legal status

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111017

2013-06-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20130606

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111102

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111016

2012-08-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120503

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111016

2012-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120416

2012-08-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69718343

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120629

2012-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111016

2012-06-18 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ML

- Ref Document Number: 20030400023

- Country of Ref Document: GR

- Effective date: 20120503

2012-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-04-23 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES;SEARCHED & EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20120416

2011-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20101026

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101013

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101020

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100915

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101013

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-02-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20101014

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101020

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-12-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20100921

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031009

2003-08-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2190544

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-03-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030114

2003-02-27 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20030400023

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2003-02-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69718343

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20030213

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB GR IT PT

2003-01-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010508

2000-01-19 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19991203

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB GR IT PT

1999-08-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981120

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB GR IT PT