Global Patent Index - EP 0936434 A3

EP 0936434 A3 2000-05-31 - Pistol having a safety lock

Title (en)

Pistol having a safety lock

Title (de)

Pistole mit Sperreinrichtung

Title (fr)

Pistolet muni d'une sécurité électronique

Publication

EP 0936434 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99810083 A

Priority

DE 19805306 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0936434A2] The pistol has an arrangement which blocks the ejection mechanism if the pistol is operated by an unauthorised person and which contains an identification unit (20) for detecting an identification signal, a controller (24) connected to the identification unit which compares the entered signal with a stored identification pattern, an electromechanical actuation element (27,28) connected to the controller, whose drive is connected to a blocking element (33) movable into blocking and release positions, a battery and several display elements (22) showing the operating state of the arrangement. When in the blocking position the blocking element blocks the trigger mechanism.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 17/04 (2006.01); F41A 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 17/066 (2013.01); F41A 17/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19805306 A1 19990812; EP 0936434 A2 19990818; EP 0936434 A3 20000531; EP 1548388 A1 20050629; US 6293039 B1 20010925

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20051214

2005-04-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: S.A.T. SWISS ARMS TECHNOLOGY AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031202

2002-06-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: S.A.T. SWISS ARMS TECHNOLOGY AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000624

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI